IA HF2527 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 623.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the exhibition of music, including the practices of performing rights societies and the advertising, promoting, and conducting of certain live musical performances, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 2304.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the exhibition of music, including the practices of performing rights societies and the advertising, promoting, and conducting of certain live musical performances, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 2304.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSubcommittee: Sweeney, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 623.
2020-03-12SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 611.
2020-03-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 611.
2020-03-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 587.
2020-03-12HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 592.
2020-03-11HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 582.
2020-03-11HouseAmendment H-8090 adopted. H.J. 581.
2020-03-11HouseAmendment H-8070 withdrawn. H.J. 581.
2020-03-05HouseAmendment H-8090 filed. H.J. 516.
2020-03-03HouseAmendment H-8070 filed. H.J. 447.
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 336.

Same As/Similar To

HF2304 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback