IA HF2520 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 472.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 472.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the purchase price of specified digital products, prewritten computer software, and related services sold to public utilities, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 615.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the purchase price of specified digital products, prewritten computer software, and related services sold to public utilities, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 615.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 472. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 452. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 452. |
2022-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 504. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 502. |
2022-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 353. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB615 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2520.