IA HF2520 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the development and utilization of high-speed electronic transmission mediums. (Formerly HF 2107.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the development and utilization of high-speed electronic transmission mediums. (Formerly HF 2107.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Mathis, and R. Smith. S.J. 564. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 541. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 541. |
2020-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 513. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 565. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 507. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 335. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2107 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.