IA HF2510 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 613.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 613.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rate regulatory proceedings before the utilities board within the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly HSB 591.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rate regulatory proceedings before the utilities board within the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly HSB 591.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 613. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 589. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 589. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 556. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8088 adopted. H.J. 556. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendments H-8124, H-8111, to amendment H-8088, H-8112, to amendment H-8088, H-8113, to amendment H-8088 and H-8114, to amendment H-8088 withdrawn. H.J. 556. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendments H-8121, H-8122 and H-8123 withdrawn. H.J. 555. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendments H-8111, H-8112, H-8113, H-8114, H-8121, H-8122, H-8123 and H-8124 filed. H.J. 534. |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8088 filed. H.J. 515. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 333. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3084 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bisignano, and Dawson.
HSB591 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 308.
HSB591 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 308.