IA HF2495 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 806.
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 806.
Summary
A bill for an act specifying those authorized to solemnize marriages in this state, and including effective date and future repeal provisions.
Title
A bill for an act specifying those authorized to solemnize marriages in this state, and including effective date and future repeal provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 806. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 683. | |
2010-03-03 | Subcommittee, Kreiman, Boettger, and Jochum. S.J. 649. | |
2010-03-03 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 639. | |
2010-03-03 | Message from House. S.J. 639. | |
2010-03-02 | Immediate message. H.J. 798. | |
2010-03-02 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 3. H.J. 797. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendment H-8303 adopted. H.J. 796. | |
2010-03-02 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration of amendment H-8303. H.J. 796. | |
2010-03-02 | Amendment H-8303 filed. H.J. 796. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 615. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1440C&ga=83 |