IA HF2477 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Amendment S-5299 filed. S.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Amendment S-5299 filed. S.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosures of information to the auditor of state. (Formerly HSB 675.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosures of information to the auditor of state. (Formerly HSB 675.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5299 filed. S.J. 1038. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 888. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Breitbach, Sinclair, Hogg, and McCoy. S.J. 843. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Government Oversight. S.J. 825. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 825. |
2018-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 709. |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 709. |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 656. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB675 (Related) 2018-03-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 653.