IA HF2475 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to governmental ethics and the regulation of lobbyists and gifts and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 674.) Effective 5-16-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to governmental ethics and the regulation of lobbyists and gifts and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 674.) Effective 5-16-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 997. |
2018-05-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 930. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1036. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0. S.J. 1036. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 887. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Breitbach, Sinclair, Hogg, and McCoy. S.J. 843. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Government Oversight. S.J. 825. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 825. |
2018-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 709. |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 708. |
2018-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8310 adopted. H.J. 707. |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8310 filed. H.J. 672. |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 656. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB674 (Related) 2018-03-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 653.