IA HF2470 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 744.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to qualifications for holding professional licensure in this state, including the granting of licenses to persons licensed in other states and acquiring residence in Iowa, disqualification provisions for criminal convictions, the waiver of application fees, and licensee discipline, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 647; See HF 2627.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to qualifications for holding professional licensure in this state, including the granting of licenses to persons licensed in other states and acquiring residence in Iowa, disqualification provisions for criminal convictions, the waiver of application fees, and licensee discipline, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 647; See HF 2627.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 744.
2020-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and McConkey. H.J. 349.
2020-02-20HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 315.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3122 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB647 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
HF2627 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback