IA HF2466 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Amendment H-8392 filed. H.J. 823.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Amendment H-8392 filed. H.J. 823.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the management of the spread of diseases in wild animals, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2166.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the management of the spread of diseases in wild animals, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2166.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Amendment H-8392 filed. H.J. 823. |
2018-04-18 | House | Senate amendment H-8386 filed. H.J. 813. |
2018-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 805. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 958. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0. S.J. 958. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5176 out of order. S.J. 957. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5250 filed, adopted. S.J. 957. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendments S-5244 and S-5248 withdrawn. S.J. 957. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendments S-5244 and S-5248 filed. S.J. 946. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5176 filed. S.J. 751. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 672. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Kapucian, and Kinney. S.J. 593. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 567. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 533. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 533. |
2018-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 459. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 93 nays 1. H.J. 459. |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 397. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2166 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 459.