IA HF2464 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to environmental protection by modifying and eliminating allocations from the statutory allocations fund to the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund and the renewable fuel infrastructure fund, making related changes, including changes related to the repeal of the environmental protection charge on petroleum diminution, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2381) (Formerly HSB 638)
Title
A bill for an act relating to environmental protection by modifying and eliminating allocations from the statutory allocations fund to the Iowa comprehensive petroleum underground storage tank fund and the renewable fuel infrastructure fund, making related changes, including changes related to the repeal of the environmental protection charge on petroleum diminution, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2381) (Formerly HSB 638)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 763. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 798. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 797. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 796. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Bolkcom, and Feenstra. S.J. 787. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 742. |
2016-04-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 751. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 735. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8281 filed, adopted. H.J. 735. |
2016-04-21 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 724. |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 700. |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 677. |