IA HF2463 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 680.) Effective date: 07/01/2022. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 680.) Effective date: 07/01/2022. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 852. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 851. |
2022-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 604. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 590. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 590. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2294. S.J. 589. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2294. S.J. 438. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 438. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 467. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 462. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8044 adopted. H.J. 462. |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee amendment H-8044 filed H.J. 323. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 298. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3110 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2294.
HSB680 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
SF2294 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 590.
HSB680 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
SF2294 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 590.