IA HF2460 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to human trafficking including parole and work release and victim counselors, and guardian ad litem appointments for prosecuting witnesses with mental disabilities. (Formerly HSB 530.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to human trafficking including parole and work release and victim counselors, and guardian ad litem appointments for prosecuting witnesses with mental disabilities. (Formerly HSB 530.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 937. |
2024-05-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 875. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 904. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 903. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2170. S.J. 903. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2170. S.J. 462. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 462. |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 534. |
2024-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 554. |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 3. H.J. 523. |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8118 adopted. H.J. 522. |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8084 withdrawn. H.J. 522. |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8118 filed. H.J. 498. |
2024-03-04 | House | Chief Clerk's report H.J. 495. |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8084 filed. H.J. 453. |
2024-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 242. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB530 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2460.
SSB3027 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2170.
SF2170 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.
SSB3027 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2170.
SF2170 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.