IA HF2457 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 703. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 756. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote withdrawn. S.J. 756. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on bill. S.J. 753. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 744. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5148 filed, lost. S.J. 743. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2321. S.J. 743. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2321. S.J. 725. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 725. |
2016-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 663. |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 44. H.J. 656. |
2016-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8217 lost. H.J. 656. |
2016-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8217 filed. H.J. 655. |
2016-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 651. |