IA HF2450 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 12:00PM RM 315.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


A bill for an act relating to DNA profiling of certain criminal offenders. (Formerly HSB 581.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


A bill for an act relating to DNA profiling of certain criminal offenders. (Formerly HSB 581.)


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 12:00PM RM 315.
2018-03-12SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Taylor and Zaun. S.J. 651.
2018-03-08SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 598.
2018-03-08SenateMessage from House. S.J. 598.
2018-03-07HouseImmediate message. H.J. 512.
2018-03-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 576.
2018-03-07HousePassed House, ayes 97 nays none. H.J. 509.
2018-03-07HouseAmendment H-8110 adopted. H.J. 508.
2018-02-26HouseAmendment H-8110 filed. H.J. 395.
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 336.

Iowa State Sources

Bill Comments