IA HF2443 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate amendment H-8255 filed. H.J. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate amendment H-8255 filed. H.J. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to eligibility requirements and assessments for students under the senior year plus program and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 642.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to eligibility requirements and assessments for students under the senior year plus program and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 642.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Senate amendment H-8255 filed. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 686. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 746. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 745. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5121 filed, adopted. S.J. 745. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 657. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 10:00AM RM G17. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 530. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 500. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 500. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 439. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 438. |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB642 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 296.