IA HF2442 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act directing the office of the chief information officer and the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission to jointly conduct a feasibility study relating to internet exchange points. (Formerly HSB 588.)
Title
A bill for an act directing the office of the chief information officer and the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission to jointly conduct a feasibility study relating to internet exchange points. (Formerly HSB 588.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 710. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 680. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 563. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 541. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 541. |
2020-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 513. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 565. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 502. |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB588 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.