IA HF2436 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of an interim study committee relating to the use of intermediate criminal sanctions and probation revocations. (Formerly HF 2294.)
Title
A bill for an act requesting the establishment of an interim study committee relating to the use of intermediate criminal sanctions and probation revocations. (Formerly HF 2294.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Schultz, and Taylor. S.J. 651. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 540. |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 332. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2294 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 548.