IA HF2418 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain information in proceedings before the director of the department of education and the board of educational examiners, certain requests made to the school budget review committee, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2147.) Effective date: 06/25/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain information in proceedings before the director of the department of education and the board of educational examiners, certain requests made to the school budget review committee, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2147.) Effective date: 06/25/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 816. |
2020-06-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 754. |
2020-06-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 748. |
2020-06-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8254. H.J. 747. |
2020-06-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-10 | House | Senate amendment H-8254 filed. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 686. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 746. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 744. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5120 filed, adopted. S.J. 744. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 531. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Giddens, and Lofgren. S.J. 470. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 445. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 445. |
2020-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 393. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 405. |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 391. |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 285. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2147 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.