IA HF2412 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of public improvement for public construction bidding purposes. (Formerly HSB 589.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of public improvement for public construction bidding purposes. (Formerly HSB 589.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 755. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 826. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 861. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 825. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 613. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Jochum. S.J. 503. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 445. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 445. |
2020-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 393. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 405. |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 389. |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 284. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB589 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.