IA HF2409 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to low-speed electric bicycles, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 630.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to low-speed electric bicycles, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 630.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Kurtz and Mitchell. H.J. 293. |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 283. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB630 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
SF2205 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354. S.J. 380.
SF2354 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 380.
SF2205 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354. S.J. 380.
SF2354 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 380.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2409 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2409.html |