IA HF2402 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an agent’s termination or suspension of authority for a power of attorney. (Formerly HF 2105.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an agent’s termination or suspension of authority for a power of attorney. (Formerly HF 2105.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 753.
2018-04-03HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 733.
2018-04-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 733.
2018-03-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 681.
2018-03-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 781.
2018-03-27SenatePassed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 781.
2018-03-22SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 600.
2018-03-01SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Schultz. S.J. 513.
2018-02-27SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 464.
2018-02-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 464.
2018-02-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 405.
2018-02-27HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 425.
2018-02-27HousePassed House, ayes 97 nays none. H.J. 404.
2018-02-27HouseAmendment H-8106 adopted. H.J. 403.
2018-02-26HouseAmendment H-8106 filed. H.J. 395.
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295.

Same As/Similar To

HF2105 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 425.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback