IA HF2386 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to grounds for termination of parental rights of an individual relative to sexual abuse. Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act relating to grounds for termination of parental rights of an individual relative to sexual abuse. Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 587. |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 489. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 550. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 548. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 502. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 448. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 448. |
2016-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 426. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 425. |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8024 adopted. H.J. 425. |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendments H-8063 and H-8070 out of order. H.J. 425. |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8057 withdrawn. H.J. 425. |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8070 filed. H.J. 417. |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8063 filed. H.J. 401. |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8057 filed. H.J. 377. |
2016-02-23 | House | Amendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 314. |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 285. |