IA HF2383 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to private employer alcohol testing policies. (Formerly HSB 659.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to private employer alcohol testing policies. (Formerly HSB 659.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 700. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 649. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 737. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 5. S.J. 734. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 653. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, Bisignano, and Brown. S.J. 423. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 408. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 408. |
2018-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 2. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 280. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB659 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.