IA HF2380 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to acreage limitations for the production of hemp, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2088.) Effective date: 04/21/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to acreage limitations for the production of hemp, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2088.) Effective date: 04/21/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 852. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 851. |
2022-06-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 709. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 634. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 630. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2110. S.J. 630. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2110. S.J. 397. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 397. |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 419. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, 1 nay. H.J. 411. |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment H-8074 adopted. H.J. 411. |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment H-8074 filed. H.J. 348. |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 240. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2088 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.