IA HF2375 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly HSB 599.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly HSB 599.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8043 filed. H.J. 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 278. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB599 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3158 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2331 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692.
SSB3158 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2331 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2375 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2375.html |