IA HF2359 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dickey, and Quirmbach. S.J. 401.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dickey, and Quirmbach. S.J. 401.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of a county treasurer to postpone or cancel an annual tax sale.(Formerly HSB 664.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of a county treasurer to postpone or cancel an annual tax sale.(Formerly HSB 664.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dickey, and Quirmbach. S.J. 401. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 389. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 389. |
2022-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 378. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 237. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB664 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2359.
SSB3121 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2281.
SF2281 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dickey, and Quirmbach. S.J. 369.
SSB3121 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2281.
SF2281 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dickey, and Quirmbach. S.J. 369.