IA HF2357 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to registration fees for motor vehicles transferred to a nonprofit corporation for donation to needy individuals. (Formerly HF 2074)
Title
A bill for an act relating to registration fees for motor vehicles transferred to a nonprofit corporation for donation to needy individuals. (Formerly HF 2074)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Moore, Landon, and Stutsman. H.J. 378. |
2014-02-25 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 300. |