IA HF2355 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing an office within the department of public safety to oversee efforts to combat human trafficking. (Formerly HF 2192)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing an office within the department of public safety to oversee efforts to combat human trafficking. (Formerly HF 2192)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 488.
2016-03-16HouseSubstituted SF 2191. H.J. 482.
2016-03-10HouseFiscal note, revised. HCS.
2016-03-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 456.
2016-03-03HouseFiscal note. HCS.
2016-02-19HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 265.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback