IA HF2350 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a rural veterinarian loan repayment program for veterinary students and certain licensed veterinarians and a rural veterinary care trust fund, and making appropriations. (See HF 2448, HF 2615.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a rural veterinarian loan repayment program for veterinary students and certain licensed veterinarians and a rural veterinary care trust fund, and making appropriations. (See HF 2448, HF 2615.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Landon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 711. |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 296. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Kerr and Winckler. H.J. 261. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 256. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2176 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2398. S.J. 484.
HF2448 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2398 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
HF2615 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
HF2448 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2398 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
HF2615 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2350 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2350.html |