IA HF2347 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including by requiring community colleges and certain private institutions of higher education to publish information related to the average income and student debt of graduates, requiring school districts to provide students enrolled in grades eleven and twelve with information related to the average income and student debt of graduates of postsecondary institutions in the state, and modifying provisions related to supplementary weighting.(See HF 2615.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including by requiring community colleges and certain private institutions of higher education to publish information related to the average income and student debt of graduates, requiring school districts to provide students enrolled in grades eleven and twelve with information related to the average income and student debt of graduates of postsecondary institutions in the state, and modifying provisions related to supplementary weighting.(See HF 2615.)
Sponsors
Rep. Devon Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 450. |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2615. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 317. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 12:15PM House Lounge. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Gehlbach, Ingels and Kurth. H.J. 256. |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 210. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2615 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 938.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2347 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2347.html |