IA HF2344 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the construction and maintenance of rumble strips on certain highways, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2059.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the construction and maintenance of rumble strips on certain highways, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2059.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment H-8081 filed. H.J. 397. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 235. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2059 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2344.