IA HF2343 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 894.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the department of natural resources to conduct pheasant studies, contingent on outside funding, and including a repeal. Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the department of natural resources to conduct pheasant studies, contingent on outside funding, and including a repeal. Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 894. | |
2012-04-24 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 878. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 878. | |
2012-04-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 833. | |
2012-04-18 | Immediate message. S.J. 820. | |
2012-04-18 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 1. S.J. 817. | |
2012-03-27 | Deferred. S.J. 671. | |
2012-03-27 | Substituted for Senate File 2253. S.J. 670. | |
2012-03-07 | Read first time and attached to companion Senate File 2253. S.J. 483. | |
2012-03-07 | Message from House. S.J. 483. | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate message. H.J. 457. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 443. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 306. |