IA HF2342 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the display of a county name on vehicle registration plates.(Formerly HSB 618.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the display of a county name on vehicle registration plates.(Formerly HSB 618.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 590. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 234. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3045 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2229.
HSB618 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2342.
SF2229 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.
HSB618 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2342.
SF2229 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2342 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2342.html |