IA HF2336 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the crime of invasion of privacy.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the crime of invasion of privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Lohse and Olson. H.J. 261. |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2157 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2286. S.J. 340.
SF2286 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
SF2286 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2336 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2336.html |