IA HF2318 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons authorized to request assistance pursuant to the statewide mutual aid compact. (See HF 2528.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons authorized to request assistance pursuant to the statewide mutual aid compact. (See HF 2528.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Thorup [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 323. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Hanusa and Kacena. H.J. 274. |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3154 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
SF2361 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 817.
HF2528 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
SF2361 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 817.
HF2528 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2318 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2318.html |