IA HF2315 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal identification and criminal history and intelligence data, including fingerprints and palm prints. (Formerly HSB 525.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal identification and criminal history and intelligence data, including fingerprints and palm prints. (Formerly HSB 525.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 702. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 680. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2264. S.J. 680. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2264. S.J. 405. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 405. |
2024-02-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 427. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-29 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 482. |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 416. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB525 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2315.
SSB3017 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
SF2264 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 681.
SSB3017 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
SF2264 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 681.