IA HF230 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Green. S.J. 391.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the child and dependent care and early childhood development tax credits, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 1.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the child and dependent care and early childhood development tax credits, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 1.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSubcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Green. S.J. 391.
2021-02-11SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 320.
2021-02-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 320.
2021-02-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 368.
2021-02-11HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 382.
2021-02-10HousePassed House, yeas 93, nays 1. H.J. 340.
2021-01-27HouseFiscal note.
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 207.

Same As/Similar To

HF1 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
SF119 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback