IA HF2299 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions. (See HF 2556.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to notification of the general assembly concerning certain state government leases and real property acquisitions. (See HF 2556.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Landon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 330. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Anderson and Bergan. H.J. 251. |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 223. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2556 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor. H.J. 796.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2299 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2299.html |