IA HF2291 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 469.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 469.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of the college student aid commission to organize a nonprofit corporation. (Formerly HF 2126.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of the college student aid commission to organize a nonprofit corporation. (Formerly HF 2126.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 469. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 429. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 429. |
2020-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 383. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 405. |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 378. |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2126 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
SF2219 (Similar To) 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 290.
SF2219 (Similar To) 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 290.