IA HF2289 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2100. S.J. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2100. S.J. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of certain judicial officers and the clerks of the district court. (Formerly HF 2002)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of certain judicial officers and the clerks of the district court. (Formerly HF 2002)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2100. S.J. 522. | |
2012-03-13 | Message from House. S.J. 522. | |
2012-03-12 | Immediate message. H.J. 516. | |
2012-03-12 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 515. | |
2012-03-12 | Amendment H-8058 adopted. H.J. 515. | |
2012-03-12 | Amendments H-8098 and H-8024 withdrawn. H.J. 515. | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment H-8098 filed. H.J. 415. | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment H-8058 filed. H.J. 377. | |
2012-02-16 | Amendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 295. | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 260. |