IA HF2285 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 709.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 709.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to supplemental reimbursement for eligible ground emergency medical transportation providers through the Medicaid program, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2103.) Effective 3-29-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to supplemental reimbursement for eligible ground emergency medical transportation providers through the Medicaid program, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2103.) Effective 3-29-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 709. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 709. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 706. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 669. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bolkcom, and Segebart. S.J. 428. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 319. |
2018-02-20 | House | Amendment H-8044 adopted. H.J. 318. |
2018-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8044 filed. H.J. 308. |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 227. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2103 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 326.