IA HF2282 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning compensation of college athletes and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act concerning compensation of college athletes and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Ras Smith [D] | Rep. Joe Mitchell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Nielsen and Sorensen. H.J. 251. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 232. |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 217. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2282 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2282.html |