IA HF2279 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Amendments H-8135, H-8136 and H-8137 filed. H.J. 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Amendments H-8135, H-8136 and H-8137 filed. H.J. 505.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the state, including unemployment benefits and civil torts.(Formerly HSB 631.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the state, including unemployment benefits and civil torts.(Formerly HSB 631.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Amendments H-8135, H-8136 and H-8137 filed. H.J. 505. |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment H-8017 and H-8018 filed. H.J. 254. |
2022-02-09 | House | Amendment H-8008 filed. H.J. 214. |
2022-02-09 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 191. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB631 (Related) 2022-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2279.
SSB3093 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2275.
SF2275 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.
SSB3093 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2275.
SF2275 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552.