IA HF2270 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child care reimbursement rates under the state child care assistance program. (Formerly HF 2067.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to child care reimbursement rates under the state child care assistance program. (Formerly HF 2067.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 681. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Mathis, and Segebart. S.J. 608. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 547. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 547. |
2020-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays 1. H.J. 521. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8041 withdrawn. H.J. 521. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8052 lost. H.J. 521. |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8052 filed. H.J. 417. |
2020-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8041 filed. H.J. 407. |
2020-02-12 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 205. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2067 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 532.