IA HF2269 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to inmate reading rooms in correctional institutions. (Formerly HSB 554.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to inmate reading rooms in correctional institutions. (Formerly HSB 554.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 214. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3035 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB554 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2136 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
HSB554 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2136 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 692.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2269 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2269.html |