IA HF2267 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of dental hygienists and dental assistants, and the practice of dentistry, and providing administrative penalties. (Formerly HSB 153.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of dental hygienists and dental assistants, and the practice of dentistry, and providing administrative penalties. (Formerly HSB 153.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 593. |
2020-03-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 588. |
2020-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 450. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 515. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 512. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2233. S.J. 511. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2233. S.J. 499. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 499. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 427. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 424. |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 204. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB153 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 192.
SSB1235 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 2:00PM G17.
SSB1235 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 2:00PM G17.