IA HF2260 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Placed on calendar H.J. 324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Placed on calendar H.J. 324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the proposal of rural four-lane bypasses by the department of transportation to the state transportation commission.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the proposal of rural four-lane bypasses by the department of transportation to the state transportation commission.
Sponsors
Rep. David Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 324. |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 324. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Sieck, Isenhart and Worthan. H.J. 251. |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 203. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2260 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2260.html |