IA HF2258 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 802.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 802.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the uses of remitted sales tax revenue and moneys from the flood mitigation fund under the flood mitigation program and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 510.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the uses of remitted sales tax revenue and moneys from the flood mitigation fund under the flood mitigation program and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 510.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 802. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 789. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 789. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 906. |
2018-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 778. |
2018-04-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 773. |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 772. |
2018-04-11 | House | House concurred H-8351. H.J. 772. |
2018-04-03 | House | Senate amendment H-8351 filed. H.J. 734. |
2018-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 728. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 851. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 851. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5155 adopted. S.J. 851. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5155 filed. S.J. 679. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 679. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Lofgren. S.J. 592. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 544. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 544. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 473. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 488. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays none. H.J. 468. |
2018-02-06 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 212. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB510 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.