IA HF2252 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to programs and services under the purview of the department of human services including child care assistance, child and family services, foster care, adoption, and the dependent adult abuse information registry. (Formerly HSB 616.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to programs and services under the purview of the department of human services including child care assistance, child and family services, foster care, adoption, and the dependent adult abuse information registry. (Formerly HSB 616.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 939. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 939. |
2022-06-30 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 780. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 710. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 708. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2171. S.J. 708. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2171. S.J. 374. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 374. |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 345. |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 339. |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment H-8054 adopted. H.J. 338. |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8054 filed. H.J. 324. |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3066 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2171.
HSB616 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2252.
SF2171 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 709.
HSB616 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2252.
SF2171 (Similar To) 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 709.