IA HF2251 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to antique vehicle special registration plates.(Formerly HF 2007.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to antique vehicle special registration plates.(Formerly HF 2007.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 8:00AM RM 304. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Maxwell and Winckler. H.J. 208. |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 180. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2007 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2251.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2251 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2251.html |